TN SJR0464 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourns 2017 session on May 10, 2017.
Title
Adjourns 2017 session on May 10, 2017.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-10 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0464&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SJR0464.pdf |