TN SJR0404 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jerry Dewayne Hurdle, Boys and Girls Club of the Hatchie River Region Youth of the Year
Title
Jerry Dewayne Hurdle, Boys and Girls Club of the Hatchie River Region Youth of the Year
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-05 | House | Concurred, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/5/17 |
2017-05-04 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 5/4/17 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |