TN SJR0393 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - HJR 396 substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Nicholas Darnell, State Board of Education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nicholas Darnell, State Board of Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateHJR 396 substituted
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/24/2019
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-08SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-02SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback