TN SJR0329 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans. Comm.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans. Comm.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
"Decade of Action for Road Safety Day," May 11, 2011
Title
"Decade of Action for Road Safety Day," May 11, 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans. Comm. | |
2011-05-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-05-05 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0329&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SJR0329.pdf |