TN SJR0241 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

The Webb School girls' basketball team, TSSAA Division II-A State Champions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and commend the members and coaches of The Webb School girls' basketball team upon winning the TSSAA Division II-A state championship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-03-24SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-03-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-03-22HouseConcurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-03-18HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/22/21
2021-03-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/18/2021
2021-03-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-03-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback