TN SJR0231 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Employees of Bristol Motor Speedway
Title
Employees of Bristol Motor Speedway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-07 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3-7-19 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |