TN SJR0167 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Ernest Burgess
Title
Ernest Burgess
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-02-18 | House | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-02-14 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2-18-19 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/14/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |