TN SJR0151 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Brigadier General Robin Mealer, Board of Trustees, Austin Peay State University
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Brigadier General Robin Mealer, (ret.), to the state university board of Austin Peay State University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-26 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |