TN SJR0127 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Directs TACIR to perform a job analysis of the members of the general assembly which includes, but is not limited to, studying the per diem structure, the number of counties each legislator represents, local governments, the population of each district, and the distance each member travels to and from the capitol.
Title
Directs TACIR to perform a job analysis of the members of the general assembly which includes, but is not limited to, studying the per diem structure, the number of counties each legislator represents, local governments, the population of each district, and the distance each member travels to and from the capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2014 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |