TN SJR0111 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Major General Terry M. "Max" Haston
Title
Major General Terry M. "Max" Haston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/6/2019 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/4/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0111&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SJR0111.pdf |