TN SJR0026 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Mark Pirtle, Rutherford County Chamber of Commerce 2016 Business Legend of the Year
Title
Mark Pirtle, Rutherford County Chamber of Commerce 2016 Business Legend of the Year
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-02-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-02-06 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2017-02-02 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/6/17 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/2/2017 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |