TN SJR0025 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes transmittal of the state budget document for fiscal year 2011-2012 by Monday, March 14, 2011; authorizes filing of budget legislation by Monday, March 21, 2011.
Title
Authorizes transmittal of the state budget document for fiscal year 2011-2012 by Monday, March 14, 2011; authorizes filing of budget legislation by Monday, March 21, 2011.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-15 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0025&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SJR0025.pdf |