TN SJR0017 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes importance of neurological or brain science in the training of teacher candidates and encourages such training in teacher prep programs in state universities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes importance of neurological or brain science in the training of teacher candidates and encourages such training in teacher prep programs in state universities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-05-09SenateTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-05-08SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-05-08SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-05-08SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-19SenateConcurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0
2013-04-19SenateH. Placed on Consent Calendar 3 for 4/19/2013
2013-02-19SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2013-02-13SenatePlaced on cal. Education Committee for 2/19/2013
2013-02-13SenateRef. to Education Committee
2013-02-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-02-11SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2013-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/11/2013
2013-02-06SenateRec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
2013-01-30SenatePlaced on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/6/2013
2013-01-28SenateP2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
2013-01-10SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-08SenateFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback