TN SJR0009 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Def. to Summer Study in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Def. to Summer Study in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Calls for a convention of the states to plan for an Article V convention to propose a balanced budget amendment to the United States Constitution; creates a balanced budget amendment convention committee.
Title
Calls for a convention of the states to plan for an Article V convention to propose a balanced budget amendment to the United States Constitution; creates a balanced budget amendment convention committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Def. to Summer Study in State Government Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0003) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/6/2017 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Recommended for adoption with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/31/2017 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |