TN SJR0003 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes additional language in Article II, Section 28 to prohibit the general assembly from levying, authorizing, or otherwise permitting any state tax on property.
Title
Proposes additional language in Article II, Section 28 to prohibit the general assembly from levying, authorizing, or otherwise permitting any state tax on property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/5/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |