TN SB9010 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds cash as a form of eligible collateral for purposes of the collateral required to be pledged to secure public deposits; decreases the collateral pledge level for public deposits held by collateral pool banks. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 4, relative to the collateral pledged to secure public deposits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2 | |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 10/29/2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB9073 (Crossfiled) 2021-11-18 - Effective date(s) 11/12/2021