TN HB9073 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds cash as a form of eligible collateral for purposes of the collateral required to be pledged to secure public deposits; decreases the collateral pledge level for public deposits held by collateral pool banks. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 4, relative to the collateral pledged to secure public deposits.
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. John Gillespie [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Effective date(s) 11/12/2021 | |
2021-11-18 | Pub. Ch. 2 | |
2021-11-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-11-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-11-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-11-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-10-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 1 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-10-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-10-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Banking Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Banking Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9010 (Crossfiled) 2021-11-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2