TN SB3626 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts motor vehicle dismantlers and recyclers or scrap metal processors from obtaining a copy of title before purchasing motor vehicle for scrap if the vehicle was manufactured more than 12 years ago; specifies that state law preempts any local regulation in regard to age of vehicle that may be purchased without title and in regard to waiting period for crushing. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 3, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, exempts motor vehicle dismantlers and recyclers or scrap metal processors from obtaining a copy of title before purchasing motor vehicle for scrap if the vehicle was manufactured more than 12 years ago; specifies that state law preempts any local regulation in regard to age of vehicle that may be purchased without title and in regard to waiting period for crushing. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 3, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 684 | |
2012-03-26 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0893) | |
2012-03-26 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-03-22 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/26/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Action Def. in S. T&S Comm. to 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm. | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2437 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 684