TN HB2437 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts motor vehicle dismantlers and recyclers or scrap metal processors from obtaining a copy of title before purchasing motor vehicle for scrap if the vehicle was manufactured more than 12 years ago; specifies that state law preempts any local regulation in regard to age of vehicle that may be purchased without title and in regard to waiting period for crushing. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 3, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, exempts motor vehicle dismantlers and recyclers or scrap metal processors from obtaining a copy of title before purchasing motor vehicle for scrap if the vehicle was manufactured more than 12 years ago; specifies that state law preempts any local regulation in regard to age of vehicle that may be purchased without title and in regard to waiting period for crushing. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 3, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Vince Dean [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 684 | |
2012-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/10/12 | |
2012-04-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-03-29 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-03-29 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-03-28 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-27 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-03-26 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-26 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-03-26 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-03-22 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-03-22 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-22 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0878) | |
2012-03-15 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2012 | |
2012-03-15 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3626 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 684