TN SB3423 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases period of denial of license due to withdrawal from secondary school from 18 to 21 years of age with certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, increases period of denial of license due to withdrawal from secondary school from 18 to 21 years of age with certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm. | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2087 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-14 - Action Def. in Education Committee to Education Oversight
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3423&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3423.pdf |