TN SB2966 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, enacts the Humboldt Utilities Authority Act to create and empower the Humboldt Utilities Authority. - Amends Chapter 61 of the Private Acts of 2001.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 61 of the Private Acts of 2001; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Humboldt Utilities Authority Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 41 | |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2981 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Pr. Ch. 41