TN HB2981 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Pr. Ch. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Pr. Ch. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, enacts the Humboldt Utilities Authority Act to create and empower the Humboldt Utilities Authority. - Amends Chapter 61 of the Private Acts of 2001.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 61 of the Private Acts of 2001; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Humboldt Utilities Authority Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Pr. Ch. 41 | |
2024-03-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2024-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2966 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 41