TN SB2956 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to expunction of court files and records in juvenile court cases, allows unruly juveniles to petition for expunction of court files and records, and extends expunction to other scientific methods of establishing identity. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-155; Section 37-1-153 and Section 40-32-101.
Title
As introduced, makes various changes to expunction of court files and records in juvenile court cases, allows unruly juveniles to petition for expunction of court files and records, and extends expunction to other scientific methods of establishing identity. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-155; Section 37-1-153 and Section 40-32-101.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3069 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2956&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2956.pdf |