TN SB2926 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, sets the minimum contract amount required by competitive bidding for general fund, board of education, and road department purchases at $25,000 or more. - Amends Chapter 313 of the Private Acts of 1951; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 313 of the Private Acts of 1951; as amended by Chapter 38 of the Private Acts of 1987; Chapter 29 of the Private Acts of 2007; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to purchasing in Bradley County.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 60 | |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2909 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Pr. Ch. 60