TN SB2919 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, changes the date of biennial city elections for mayor and councilmen from the last Thursday to the second Thursday in September; clarifies that ordinances and amendments to ordinances are to be made available for inspection by the public rather than read in full; specifies that the mayor must nominate a member from the council as vice mayor, to be approved by the council rather then having the council to elect such person directly; expands role of city recorder to include any other administrative position the mayor determines to be beneficial to the operation of the city. - Amends Chapter 174 of the Private Acts of 1925; as amended and rewritten.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 174 of the Private Acts of 1925; as amended and rewritten by Chapter 33 of the Private Acts of 1973; Chapter 145 of the Private Acts of 1977; Chapter 302 of the Private Acts of 1980; Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 1986; Chapter 160 of the Private Acts of 2000; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter of the City of Dickson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 55 | |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2901 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Pr. Ch. 55