TN SB2906 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes references to repealed provisions of law that provided an additional definition of contractor, and additional penalties, in relation to unlawful representation as a licensed contractor. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 46; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 61; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 46; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 61; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to commerce.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2012 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-25 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.