TN SB2902 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 919
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 919
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes revisions to law relative to hazardous duty supplemental benefits; makes related benefits revisions. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 24; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37, relative to retirement benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 919 | |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2683 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2025