TN SB2882 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides a $1,000 pay supplement to emergency medical professionals who complete 40 hours of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, provides a $1,000 pay supplement to emergency medical professionals who complete 40 hours of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2715 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020