TN HB2715 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides a $1,000 pay supplement to emergency medical professionals who complete 40 hours of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, provides a $1,000 pay supplement to emergency medical professionals who complete 40 hours of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-06-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2882 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020