TN SB2780 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that a course of conduct for purposes of stalking includes one instance of placing an electronic tracking device on a person or in or on a person's property, unless the electronic tracking device is placed by or at the direction of a law enforcement officer. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to electronic tracking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2802 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-20 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee