TN SB2749 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates November 8 as "Historically Black Colleges and Universities Day." - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 15, Chapter 2, relative to Historically Black Colleges and Universities.
Sponsors
Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/24/2022 | |
2022-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 750 | |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0574) |
2022-03-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0498) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2720 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 750