TN SB2742 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds "child abuse" to the requirement that the Jerry F. Agee Tennessee Law Enforcement Academy, the Tennessee peace officer standards and training commission, and the department of children's services work together in developing ways to inform and instruct appropriate local law enforcement personnel in the detection of child sexual abuse and in the proper action that should be taken in a suspected case of child sexual abuse and requires that certain guidelines be prepared that establish a standard procedure that may be followed by police agencies in the investigation of cases involving sexual abuse of children. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 38, relative to law enforcement officer training.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 995 | |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2589 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2022