TN SB2740 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the district attorneys general conference to work with the Tennessee bureau of investigation, the department of children's services, the Tennessee Sheriffs' Association, the Tennessee Association of Chiefs of Police, and the Children's Advocacy Centers of Tennessee to develop recommendations on the creation of multidisciplinary teams to provide responses specific to child sex trafficking cases. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to sexual abuse of children.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2022 | |
2022-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 984 | |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0888) |
2022-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0895) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2592 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 984