TN SB2720 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes local correctional officers and local law enforcement officers to enroll in one course at any state-supported college or university without having to pay tuition and fees. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 1 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 1 and Title 49, relative to higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1742 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Failed in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration