TN HB1742 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Failed in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Failed in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes local correctional officers and local law enforcement officers to enroll in one course at any state-supported college or university without having to pay tuition and fees. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 1 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 1 and Title 49, relative to higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
Rep. Curtis Halford [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Failed in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2720 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee