TN SB2719 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires persons to meet certain qualifications in order to be eligible for appointment as chief executive officer of an administrative department of state government; creates a mechanism for the removal of such officers for cause by the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Title 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3 and Title 4, relative to state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2736 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee