TN SB2712 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 20 to 25 days, the time when a creditor that has redeemed land from the original purchaser for debt, or from one who has previously redeemed the land for debt, may advance upon the bid for the land any sum, to the extent of that creditor's debt, as if the creditor was the original purchaser. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 35; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 45; Title 47; Title 66 and Section 67-4-409.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 35; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 45; Title 47; Title 66 and Section 67-4-409, relative to property.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee