TN SB2702 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, funds social worker positions through the BEP at a ratio of one per 1,500 or fewer students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, funds social worker positions through the BEP at a ratio of one per 1,500 or fewer students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2051 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-15 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020