TN SB2700 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the permit issued for overweight or overdimensional loads covering the operation of multiple vehicles transporting such loads, instead of covering each specific vehicle transporting such loads. - Amends TCA Section 55-7-205.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the permit issued for overweight or overdimensional loads covering the operation of multiple vehicles transporting such loads, instead of covering each specific vehicle transporting such loads. - Amends TCA Section 55-7-205.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2340 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee