TN SB2692 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Women's Suffrage Centennial new specialty earmarked license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, creates the Women's Suffrage Centennial new specialty earmarked license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2886 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee