TN SB2681 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the board of directors of the Tennessee education lottery corporation, no later than January 1, 2019, to establish a mechanism whereby a lottery ticket winner of a drawing-style game, with winnings of $1 million dollars or more, may donate 10 percent of the total prize money to a 501(c)(3) or 501(c)(19) nonprofit organization. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires the board of directors of the Tennessee education lottery corporation, no later than January 1, 2019, to establish a mechanism whereby a lottery ticket winner of a drawing-style game, with winnings of $1 million dollars or more, may donate 10 percent of the total prize money to a 501(c)(3) or 501(c)(19) nonprofit organization. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1022 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2018-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0974) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1733 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1022