TN HB1733 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the board of directors of the Tennessee education lottery corporation, no later than January 1, 2019, to establish a mechanism whereby a lottery ticket winner of a drawing-style game, with winnings of $1 million dollars or more, may donate 10 percent of the total prize money to a 501(c)(3) or 501(c)(19) nonprofit organization. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires the board of directors of the Tennessee education lottery corporation, no later than January 1, 2019, to establish a mechanism whereby a lottery ticket winner of a drawing-style game, with winnings of $1 million dollars or more, may donate 10 percent of the total prize money to a 501(c)(3) or 501(c)(19) nonprofit organization. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1022 | |
2018-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/11/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2681 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1022