TN SB2656 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 953
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 953
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, subject to certain federal approval, abolishes certain vehicle inspection and maintenance programs to maintain compliance with national ambient air quality standards and enacts related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, subject to certain federal approval, abolishes certain vehicle inspection and maintenance programs to maintain compliance with national ambient air quality standards and enacts related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 953 | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/11/18 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1782 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 953