TN SB2614 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes appropriations to defray the costs of certain enactments of the 2010 annual session of the 106th General Assembly.
Title
As introduced, makes appropriations to defray the costs of certain enactments of the 2010 annual session of the 106th General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2554 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2614&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2614.pdf |