TN SB2606 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, requires that one road board member of road board district 5, instead of road board district 1, be elected at the August 2012 election; requires that one road board member of road board district 1, instead of road board district 5, be elected at the August 2014 election; replaces erroneous reference to “county judge” with “county executive”. - Amends Chapter 55 of the Private Acts of 1951; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, requires that one road board member of road board district 5, instead of road board district 1, be elected at the August 2012 election; requires that one road board member of road board district 1, instead of road board district 5, be elected at the August 2014 election; replaces erroneous reference to “county judge” with “county executive”. - Amends Chapter 55 of the Private Acts of 1951; as amended.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 47 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Comp. HB subst. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | P2C held on desk. Local Bill |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2515 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-22 - Pr. Ch. 47