TN SB2605 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 5, PNV 1
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 5, PNV 1
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee wildlife resources agency to enter into license agreements for the operation of facilities on lands under the control or supervision of the agency for the improved utilization of state lands and facilities; such license agreements must first be approved by the state building commission and the attorney general and reporter; clarifies that persons engaging in the business of propagating certain wildlife do not need to purchase a personal possession permit. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 70, relative to wildlife resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0770) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0646) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2732 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Comp. SB subst.