TN SB2599 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, under certain circumstances, authorizes issuance of a driver license, free of charge, to full-time students at postsecondary institutions who are nonresidents and have established residency in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, under certain circumstances, authorizes issuance of a driver license, free of charge, to full-time students at postsecondary institutions who are nonresidents and have established residency in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2661 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee