TN HB2661 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, under certain circumstances, authorizes issuance of a driver license, free of charge, to full-time students at postsecondary institutions who are nonresidents and have established residency in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, under certain circumstances, authorizes issuance of a driver license, free of charge, to full-time students at postsecondary institutions who are nonresidents and have established residency in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2599 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee