TN SB2598 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 651
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 651
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that any records obtained by or disclosed to a municipality or county by a holder of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority or any other cable or video service provider for the purpose of an audit or review will be confidential and not subject to the open records laws. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 59, Part 3 and Section 10-7-504.
Title
As enacted, specifies that any records obtained by or disclosed to a municipality or county by a holder of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority or any other cable or video service provider for the purpose of an audit or review will be confidential and not subject to the open records laws. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 59, Part 3 and Section 10-7-504.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 651 | |
2012-03-15 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0828) | |
2012-03-15 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 2/28/12 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3053 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 651