TN SB2593 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm.
Pending: Senate Environment, Conservation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm.
Pending: Senate Environment, Conservation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the department of environment and conservation from issuing permits related to surface mining activities under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 59 and Title 69, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the department of environment and conservation from issuing permits related to surface mining activities under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 59 and Title 69, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3668 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-03 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Conservation
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2593&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2593.pdf |